IDICO Investment Consultancy Joint Stock Company (HNX | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Van Hien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,000
|
0.28 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Hoang Van Hien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,000
|
0.28 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Hoang Tuan Anh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Mai Quoc Chinh
|
Member of Management Board
|
16,500
|
0.92 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Nguyen Ngoc Khanh
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
4,000
|
0.22 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ho Minh Toan
|
Chairman of the Board
|
43,700
|
2.43 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Lam An
|
Chairman of the Board
|
6,000
|
0.33 %
|
10/12/2012
|
Hoang Van Hien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,000
|
0.28 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Hoang Van Hien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,000
|
0.28 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Hoang Tuan Anh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|