Joint Stock Company for Telecoms and Informatics (HOSE | Technology)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
HOANG ANH LOC
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
487,304
|
1.51 %
|
30/06/2024
|
To Hoai Van
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
534,239
|
1.66 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen The Thinh
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
306,232
|
0.95 %
|
08/10/2021
|
Nguyen The Thinh
|
Member of Management Board
|
282,232
|
0.88 %
|
26/07/2024
|
HA THANH HAI
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative
|
119,174
|
0.37 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Tri Dung
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
724,930
|
2.25 %
|
31/12/2021
|
HOANG ANH LOC
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
487,304
|
1.51 %
|
30/06/2024
|
To Hoai Van
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
534,239
|
1.66 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen The Thinh
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
306,232
|
0.95 %
|
08/10/2021
|
Nguyen The Thinh
|
Member of Management Board
|
282,232
|
0.88 %
|
26/07/2024
|