Hai Minh Corporation (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Quang Tien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,388,305
|
10.52 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Phung Van Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
22,595
|
0.17 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vu Duc Tuan
|
Member of Management Board
|
1,000,000
|
7.58 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Tran Duc Trung
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
150,000
|
1.14 %
|
30/06/2024
|
TRAN DOAN VIEN
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
125,995
|
0.95 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Quang Tien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,388,305
|
10.52 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Phung Van Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
22,595
|
0.17 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vu Duc Tuan
|
Member of Management Board
|
1,000,000
|
7.58 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen The Quan
|
Member of the Management Board /Head of Supervisors Board
|
526,718
|
3.99 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Nguyen Quoc Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
437,385
|
3.31 %
|
30/06/2020
|