Hai Ha Confectionery Joint Stock Company (HNX | Food & Beverage)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Tang Minh Vuong
|
Member of the Management Board
|
100
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
NGUYEN MANH TUAN
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Do Thi Hong Thuy
|
Member of Management Board/Spokesman
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
BUI THI THANH HUONG
|
Member of the Management Board /General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Doan Ho Lan
|
|
100
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Le Manh Linh
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board
|
100
|
0 %
|
15/11/2023
|
Hoang Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Quach Dai Dac
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
17/09/2009
|
Bui Minh Duc
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|