Hai Phong Cement Transport And Trading Joint Stock Company (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Dang Loi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
560
|
0.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
MAI HONG HAI
|
Chairman of the Management Board /General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Nguyen Tuan Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
497,900
|
24.69 %
|
30/06/2024
|
LE VAN THANG
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
2,500
|
0.12 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN THANH PHUONG
|
Member of Management Board
|
2,500
|
0.12 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vu Xuan Bang
|
Chairman of the Board/Director
|
1,840
|
0.09 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Pham Dang Loi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
560
|
0.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
MAI HONG HAI
|
Chairman of the Management Board /General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Tran Van Hoa
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
26/05/2007
|
Nguyen Tuan Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
497,900
|
24.69 %
|
30/06/2024
|