Hang Xanh Motors Service Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Automobiles & Parts)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Tien Dung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman/Legal Representative
|
18,672,888
|
17.38 %
|
01/08/2024
|
Le Quang Dinh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
22,133
|
0.02 %
|
30/06/2016
|
Vu Thi Hanh
|
ROOT/Member of Management Board/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
17,843,359
|
16.61 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Ngoc Bich
|
Member of Management Board
|
1,475,018
|
1.37 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Quoc Hai
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
1,238,680
|
1.15 %
|
25/09/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Thi Nhi Ha
|
|
5
|
0 %
|
12/07/2011
|
Dang Pham Minh Loan
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2010
|
Do Tien Dung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman/Legal Representative
|
18,672,888
|
17.38 %
|
01/08/2024
|
Nguyen Tien Dung
|
Chairman of the Board
|
61,008
|
0.06 %
|
22/12/2009
|
Nguyen Hong Anh
|
Chairman of the Board
|
53,262
|
0.05 %
|
06/12/2011
|