Hai Phong Securities Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Financial Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vu Duong Hien
|
|
7,087,773
|
24.29 %
|
29/07/2024
|
Nguyen Anh Trung
|
|
5,121
|
0.02 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Doan Duc Luyen
|
|
100
|
0 %
|
07/08/2024
|
Khoa Thi Thanh Huyen
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
07/08/2024
|
Vu Xuan Thuy
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vu Duong Hien
|
|
7,087,773
|
24.29 %
|
29/07/2024
|
Vu Quang Khanh
|
|
15,030
|
0.05 %
|
31/12/2010
|
Pham Thi Kim Oanh
|
|
9,250
|
0.03 %
|
22/07/2009
|
Nguyen Anh Trung
|
|
5,121
|
0.02 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Doan Duc Luyen
|
|
100
|
0 %
|
07/08/2024
|