PetroVietnam Gas Joint Stock Corporation (HOSE | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Van Quang
|
|
11,450
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Thanh Binh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vo Thi Thanh Ngoc
|
Member of Management Board
|
2,400
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Van Phong
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Trieu Quoc Tuan
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Nhu Linh
|
|
34,000
|
0 %
|
30/06/2018
|
Hoang Van Quang
|
|
11,450
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Thi Lan
|
Chairman of the Board
|
100,000
|
0 %
|
03/04/2012
|
Nguyen Thanh Binh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Duong Manh Son
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board /General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|