Everland Group Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
LE DINH VINH
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
56,669,100
|
26.33 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Dinh Vinh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
7,600,000
|
3.53 %
|
06/03/2017
|
LE DINH TUAN
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
6,514,525
|
3.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Duong Thi Van Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
1,575,000
|
0.73 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Cao Thi Hoa
|
Head of Supervisors Board/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Bui Thi Bich Lien
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
LE DINH VINH
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
56,669,100
|
26.33 %
|
30/06/2024
|
LE DINH TUAN
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
6,514,525
|
3.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Duong Thi Van Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
1,575,000
|
0.73 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Thuy An
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
18/03/2017
|