Educational Book Joint Stock Company In Hanoi city (HNX | Media)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ngo Trong Vinh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
958,383
|
9.38 %
|
17/05/2024
|
Ngo Anh Phuong
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Ngo Phuong Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
2,410,200
|
23.58 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Bui Thi Thu Lan
|
Member of Management Board
|
2,000
|
0.02 %
|
30/06/2024
|
To Thanh Binh
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Trinh Thi Tuyet
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
21/01/2007
|
Ngo Trong Vinh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
958,383
|
9.38 %
|
17/05/2024
|
Dang Thanh Hai
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
17,300
|
0.17 %
|
31/12/2019
|
Nguyen Minh Khang
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
21/09/2010
|
Mac Van Thien
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
02/03/2009
|