Do Thanh Technology Corporation (HOSE | Chemicals)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
LE QUANG HIEP
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,985,817
|
24.36 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Cong Nghiep
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
1,000,000
|
12.27 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Bang Tam
|
Member of Management Board/Spokesman
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NULL
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
1,000
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Thi Thu Thao
|
Member of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Uyen Nguyen
|
|
117,869
|
1.45 %
|
20/03/2012
|
Nguyen Thi Thuy Hang
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2007
|
LE QUANG HIEP
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,985,817
|
24.36 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Cong Nghiep
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
1,000,000
|
12.27 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Gia Kiet
|
Member of Management Board
|
200,000
|
2.45 %
|
31/12/2015
|