De Tam Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Real Estate)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Thi Kim Xuan
|
General Director /Member of the Management Board
|
1,817,496
|
10.06 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Hoang Thi Thu Ha
|
Member of the Management Board
|
4,094
|
0.02 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tran Minh Ngoc
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Huu Nghia
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Cung Van Tu
|
Member of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
28/04/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Gam
|
|
4,000
|
0.02 %
|
30/06/2016
|
Nguyen Chi Thanh
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
875,200
|
4.85 %
|
26/03/2021
|
Pham Thi Kim Xuan
|
General Director /Member of the Management Board
|
1,817,496
|
10.06 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Hong Mai
|
Member of the Management Board
|
724,500
|
4.01 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tran Quang My
|
Member of Management Board
|
280,000
|
1.55 %
|
31/12/2019
|