Petrovietnam Fertilizer and Chemicals Corporation (HOSE | Chemicals)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Thi Thu Huong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Xuan Hoa
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Hoang Trong Dung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Ho Quyet Thang
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Ngoc Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Hien
|
|
97,300
|
0.02 %
|
30/06/2019
|
Cao Hoai Duong
|
|
2,000
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Dinh Quang Hoan
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Le Thi Thu Huong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Van Hoa
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2017
|