DakLak Tourist Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Travel & Leisure)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Thi Nguyet
|
Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Duong Dinh Nam
|
Spokesman
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Truong Tan Son
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Le Ngoc Co
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Le Trung Chau
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
5,000
|
0.05 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Vo Van Chau
|
Board member
|
87,672
|
0.94 %
|
31/03/2010
|
Tran Duy Khuong An
|
Board member
|
38,856
|
0.42 %
|
31/03/2010
|