HaBac Nitrogenous Ferlitizer & Chemicals Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Chemicals)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Thuy Duong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Nguyen Van Thieu
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Phung Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
4,300
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Dinh Hong
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
1,900
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Dung
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Thuy Duong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Phan Van Tien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
3,800
|
0 %
|
31/12/2017
|
Nguyen Van Thieu
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Hoang Manh Thang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2019
|
Nguyen Phung Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
4,300
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|