Cuu Long Pharmaceutical Joint Stock Corporation (HOSE | Health Care)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Minh Nguyet
|
|
10,000
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Nguyen Van Sang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Ngoc Bich
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Ngoc Mai
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Bui Hong Hanh
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Minh Nguyet
|
|
10,000
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Le Thanh Tuan
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Nguyen Van Sang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Trung Nghia
|
Board member
|
252,000
|
0.35 %
|
31/12/2011
|
Luong Van Hoa
|
|
83,912
|
0.11 %
|
02/07/2015
|