Coteccons Construction Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Van Chinh
|
|
154,700
|
0.15 %
|
30/06/2020
|
Vo Thanh Liem
|
|
151,750
|
0.15 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Bolat Duisenov
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,428,933
|
1.38 %
|
19/09/2024
|
Talgat Turumbayev
|
Member of Management Board
|
2,120,200
|
2.05 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Herwig Guido H. Van Hove
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Ba Duong
|
|
3,222,374
|
3.11 %
|
09/10/2020
|
Tran Quang Quan
|
|
1,180,107
|
1.14 %
|
30/06/2020
|
Tran Quang Tuan
|
|
730,269
|
0.70 %
|
31/12/2016
|
Le Mien Thuy
|
|
266,596
|
0.26 %
|
30/06/2020
|
Tran Van Chinh
|
|
154,700
|
0.15 %
|
30/06/2020
|