Hoang Kim Tay Nguyen Group Joint Stock Company (HNX | Travel & Leisure)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Ngoc Hoang
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Tran Van Tuan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
79,700
|
0.50 %
|
27/10/2021
|
Cao Van Duong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Ha Huy Hoang
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Tran Van Tuan
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Thi Thuy Kieu
|
|
2,520
|
0.02 %
|
29/04/2009
|
Nguyen Thi Thu Huong
|
|
2,000
|
0.01 %
|
25/02/2010
|
Tran Ngoc Hoang
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Cao Van Duong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Ha Huy Hoang
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|