ChoLon Water Supply Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
TRAN VAN CHAU
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Hua Trong Nghi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Huynh Tuan Anh
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
1,657,600
|
12.75 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Ho Le Minh
|
Member of the Management Board
|
973,570
|
7.49 %
|
30/09/2024
|
Dang Duc Hien
|
Member of Management Board
|
5,000
|
0.04 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Minh Chau
|
|
2,300
|
0.02 %
|
31/03/2010
|
TRAN VAN CHAU
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Nguyen Van Dung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Hua Trong Nghi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Huynh Tuan Anh
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
1,657,600
|
12.75 %
|
30/06/2021
|