Cat Loi Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Personal & Household Goods)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Chau Tuan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Hoang Minh
|
Member of Management Board/Director/Legal Representative
|
44,110
|
0.17 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Duc Hanh
|
Member of Management Board
|
22,830
|
0.09 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Diem Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Thi Anh
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Phan Van Tao
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
9,850
|
0.04 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Quach Kim Anh
|
Chairman of the Board
|
4,865
|
0.02 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Ha Quang Hoa
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Chau Tuan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Tuy
|
Board member
|
136,396
|
0.52 %
|
18/02/2008
|