Construction and Industrial Production Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
PHAM HUNG
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Thi Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Van Long
|
Member of Management Board
|
21,000
|
0.46 %
|
30/06/2024
|
PHAN HUY HUNG
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tran Thi Minh
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
PHAM HUNG
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Do Minh Thong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
151,453
|
3.33 %
|
12/05/2016
|
Do Chi Nguyen
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board /Director
|
12,941
|
0.28 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Tran Thi Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Dinh Minh
|
Member of Management Board
|
33,334
|
0.73 %
|
12/05/2016
|