No.5 Construction Investment Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Thi Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
27/04/2018
|
Tran Thi Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Pham Danh Tuyen
|
Legal Representative /Director /Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
VU MANH HUNG
|
Deputy Director /Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Le Van Thuyen
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen The Thanh
|
|
469,800
|
17.40 %
|
27/04/2018
|
Ha Quang Hong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
16/05/2012
|
Le Ngoc Sau
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
01/07/2011
|
Tang Van Phiet
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
01/07/2011
|
Chu Tuan Ngoc
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2015
|