DaNang Port Joint Stock Company (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Hoai An
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Nguyen Dinh Chung
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Phan Bao Loc
|
Member of Management Board
|
7,032
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Wang Chil Shiang
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Tran Le Tuan
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Duy Duong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2019
|
Nguyen Xuan Dung
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|
Nguyen Hoai An
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Nguyen Thu
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
58,400
|
0.06 %
|
07/09/2016
|
Nguyen Dinh Chung
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|