Construction Joint Stock Company 47 (HOSE | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Nam Phong
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
582,008
|
1.60 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Dong Lam
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
1,990,164
|
5.48 %
|
30/06/2024
|
DUONG MINH QUANG
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative
|
925,797
|
2.55 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Huu Hai
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
95,515
|
0.26 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Trung Nam
|
ROOT/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Truong Dinh Du
|
|
1,457
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Nguyen Luong Am
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
759,127
|
2.09 %
|
16/07/2020
|
Pham Nam Phong
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
582,008
|
1.60 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Dong Lam
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
1,990,164
|
5.48 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Truong Son
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
619,890
|
1.71 %
|
31/12/2019
|