Haiphong Packing VICEM Joint Stock Company (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
MAI HONG HAI
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board
|
3,701
|
0.12 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Nguyen Thi Kim Chi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Hong Anh Viet
|
Member of Management Board/Director/Legal Representative
|
9,050
|
0.30 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Dang Thi Thanh Huu
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Bich Hue
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Du Van Hai
|
|
6,712
|
0.22 %
|
30/06/2016
|
MAI HONG HAI
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board
|
3,701
|
0.12 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Nguyen Thi Kim Chi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Hong Anh Viet
|
Member of Management Board/Director/Legal Representative
|
9,050
|
0.30 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Van Hung
|
Member of the Management Board /Director of Department
|
5,100
|
0.17 %
|
31/12/2018
|