VICEM But Son Cement Joint Stock Company (HNX | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dao Tuan Khoi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Thi Khanh
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
2,719
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Do Tien Trinh
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen The Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Nguyen Minh Tuan
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ngo Duc Luu
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Nguyen Manh Hai
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2008
|
Nguyen Van Tan
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Pham Duc Cuong
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
1,755
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Nguyen Bich Thuy
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2013
|