Ha Noi Transformer Manufacturing And Electric Material Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Ngoc Quan
|
|
1,290,718
|
5.16 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Bich Ngoc
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Trinh Viet Dung
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Sinh
|
Member of Management Board
|
15,000
|
0.06 %
|
01/08/2024
|
Dinh Hoang Long
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Ngoc Quan
|
|
1,290,718
|
5.16 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN TRONG TIEU
|
|
2,200
|
0.01 %
|
25/03/2011
|
Tran Ngoc Minh
|
Chairman of the Board
|
36,666
|
0.15 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Pham Tuan Anh
|
Chaiman of the Board
|
100
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Nguyen Thi Bich Ngoc
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|