Sai Gon - Ha Noi Beer Corporation (UPCOM | Food & Beverage)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Van Thao Nguyen
|
|
480,027
|
2.67 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Lam Du An
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Le Viet Quy
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
5,286
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Doan Tien Dung
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Dinh Van Thuan
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Van Thao Nguyen
|
|
480,027
|
2.67 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Thi Le
|
|
5,000
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Lam Du An
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Huu Loc
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
107,860
|
0.60 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Le Viet Quy
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
5,286
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2023
|