Ha Noi - Hai Phong Beer Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Food & Beverage)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Anh Tuan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Dinh Duy Hoa
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy Director
|
9,910
|
0.11 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Duc Tien
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
3,160
|
0.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vuong Toan
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|
Tran Van Trung
|
Member of Management Board/Director/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Dinh Thanh
|
Chairman of the board
|
0
|
0 %
|
12/05/2015
|
Nguyen Tuan Phong
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2014
|
Pham Anh Tuan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Ta Thu Thuy
|
Member of the Management Board /General Director
|
31,960
|
0.35 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Pham Quoc Khanh
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy Director
|
18,540
|
0.20 %
|
31/12/2023
|