Bim Son Cement Joint Stock Company (HNX | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Huu Ha
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN HOANH VAN
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Deputy General Director/Legal Representative
|
41,798
|
0.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Huy Quan
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative
|
4
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Truong Thu
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Minh Duc
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Doan Nam Khanh
|
|
9,907,200
|
8.04 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Phan Thi Nhuong
|
|
8,100
|
0.01 %
|
08/04/2008
|
Le Xuan Khoi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
26,827,871
|
21.77 %
|
30/06/2020
|
Nguyen Thanh Chuong
|
Chairman of the Board
|
3,300,000
|
2.68 %
|
08/04/2008
|
Nguyen Nhu Khue
|
Board member/Director
|
8,400
|
0.01 %
|
08/04/2008
|