VICEM Packing But Son Joint Stock Company (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Trung Chien
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
480,000
|
8.00 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Duong Tuan Linh
|
Member of Management Board
|
461,085
|
7.68 %
|
31/12/2023
|
MAI VAN DAN
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Nguyen Manh Hai
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Tran Ngoc Hung
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Thi Doan Trang
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2008
|
Hoang Trung Chien
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
480,000
|
8.00 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Pham Van Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
162,329
|
2.71 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Pham Duc Cuong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Duong Tuan Linh
|
Member of Management Board
|
461,085
|
7.68 %
|
31/12/2023
|