A Vuong Hydropower Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Xuan Dien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Luu Ngoc Mai Phi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Ngo Viet Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Dang Thanh Binh
|
Member of Management Board
|
5,546,134
|
7.39 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Dinh Ban
|
Member of the Management Board
|
37,594
|
0.05 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Tram
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
59,627
|
0.08 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Luu Ngoc Mai Phi
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Nguyen Xuan Dien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Ngo Viet Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Dang Thanh Binh
|
Member of Management Board
|
5,546,134
|
7.39 %
|
30/06/2024
|